EUSPEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Society is to advance the arts, sciences and technology of precision engineering, micro engineering and nanotechnology; to promote its dissemination through education and training, and to promote its use by science and industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Milton Keynes
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- China
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Kazakhstan
- Latvia
- Malaysia
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- Singapore
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 14 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jorg Drescher | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jose Antonio Yague Fabra | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guido Tosello | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
BALDISH KAUR PHILLIPS | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Andreas Archenti | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helene Mainaud Durand | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF Geoffrey McFarland | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Theo Anjes Maria Ruijl | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof Liam Blunt | Trustee | 04 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ITTNER | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JELM FRANSE | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLTMANN RIEMER | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £401.50k | £214.12k | £388.05k | £424.11k | £427.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £477.24k | £258.85k | £367.27k | £398.66k | £398.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £72.57k | £50.51k | £198.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS ALTERED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14TH FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE OF PRECISION ENGINEERING AND NANOTECHNOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRANFIELD UNIVERSITY
COLLEGE ROAD
CRANFIELD
BEDFORD
MK43 0AL
- Phone:
- 01234754023
- Email:
- info@euspen.eu
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window