THE BOOMERANG CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ceased all activities, which are now carried out by St Hilary Preschool and Sunny Corner Childcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 15 August 2001: Standard registration
- 26 March 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.53k | £302 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 29 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 10 July 2006 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 24 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED 2 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION, SOCIAL, MORAL, CULTURAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL BEING OF CHILDREN DURING AND OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS PROVIDING SUCH CARE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. C) TO PROMOTE THE PARENTAL PARTICIPATION AND INVOLVEMENT IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE GROUP. D) TO ADMIT ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window