WHITECHAPEL PARENTS TEACHERS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1087889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for Whitechapel School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £5,267
Total expenditure: £3,834

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WHITECHAPEL PTFA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Muller Chair 23 November 2023
None on record
Collette Pascal Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Laura Pickup Trustee 01 March 2022
WHITECHAPEL PRESCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.55k £1.63k £5.20k £3.15k £5.27k
Total expenditure £6.88k £1.23k £2.86k £6.73k £3.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 July 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 July 2022 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Whitechapel Primary School
Church Lane
Whitechapel
PRESTON
PR3 2EP
Phone:
01995640364
Website:

No information available