Accounts and annual returns THE METHODIST CHURCH MUSIC SOCIETY (MCMS)

Charity number: 1098545
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2009 06 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 06 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 30 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 30 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 05 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 05 February 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 06 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 06 March 2006 On Time