ELITE SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds Christian church services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 08 January 2002: Standard registration
- 07 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE ELITE CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/05/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 01/05/2015 | 01/05/2016 | 01/05/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.17k | £7.77k | £7.80k | £6.04k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.22k | £5.97k | £7.19k | £5.74k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2017 | 09 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2016 | 09 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE HEALING POWER OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND TO ESTABLISH THE FOLLOWING BELIEFS AND OBJECTS 1) BELIEF IN GOD WHO IS LOVE 2) ACCEPTANCE OF THE LEADERSHIP OF JESUS CHRIST 3) BELIEF THAT GOD MANIFESTS THROUGH THE ILLIMITABLE POWER OF THE HOLY SPIRIT 4) BELIEF IN THE SURVIVAL OF THE HUMAN SOUL AND ITS INDIVIDUALITY AFTER PHYSICAL DEATH 5) BELIEF IN THE COMMUNION WITH GOD WITH HIS ANGELIC MINISTERS AND WITH THE SOULS FUNCTIONING IN CONDITIONS OTHER THAN THE EARTH LIFE 6) BELIEF THAT ALL FORMS OF LIFE CREATED BY GOD INTERMINGLE ARE INTERDEPENDENT AND EVOLVE UNTIL PERFECTION IS ATTAINED 7) BELIEF IN THE PERFECT JUSTICE OF THE DIVINE LAWS GOVERNING ALL LIFE 8) BELIEF THAT SINS COMMITTED CAN ONLY BE RECTIFIED BY THE SINNER HIMSELF OR HERSELF THROUGH THE REDEMPTIVE POWER OF JESUS CHRIST BY REPENTANCE AND SERVICE TO OTHERS AND TO PLEDGE AT ALL TIMES TO ENDEAVOUR TO BE GUIDED IN THOUGHTS WORDS AND DEEDS BY THE TEACHING AND EXAMPLE OF JESUS CHRIST
Area of benefit
MIDDLESBROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window