COWSHILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY INHABITANTS OF THE AREA FOR MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,860 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 22 June 2005: Standard registration
- COWSHILL AND LANEHEAD VILLAGE HAL (Working name)
- BARRINGTON (HEATHERY CLEUGH) EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- BARRINGTON (HEATHERYCLEUGH) EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christine Nannery | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Farrow | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hyatt | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Pulman | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Bailey | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRUCE WILLIAM PICKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.06k | £24.92k | £25.76k | £29.15k | £30.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.13k | £9.65k | £24.43k | £39.48k | £24.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.65k | £20.34k | £3.95k | £1.41k | £1.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 31 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HEATHYCLEUGH AND COWSHILL AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Westfall
Wearhead
Bp Auckland
Co Durham
DL13 1JD
- Phone:
- 01388537797
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window