Financial history MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS TRUST

Charity number: 1088353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.20m £3.08m £1.84m £2.30m £2.43m
Total expenditure £2.40m £1.94m £2.49m £2.41m £2.53m
Income from government contracts £124.76k £125.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £124.76k £125.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.68m £2.56m £1.31m £1.84m £1.86m
Income - Other trading activities £151.47k £133.60k £143.77k £85.84k £54.41k
Income - Charitable activities £204.77k £232.64k £322.78k £287.90k £367.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.79k £16.66k £34.64k £82.90k £134.37k
Income - Other £138.64k £133.04k £26.50k £5.82k £14.95k
Income - Legacies £171.22k £1.14m £198.07k £522.54k £548.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.70m £1.35m £1.80m £1.72m £1.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £701.34k £590.70k £691.88k £687.98k £711.27k
Expenditure - Governance £75.37k £74.96k £75.56k £92.61k £84.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £6.37k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £2.90k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0