Accounts and annual returns AID FOR AIDS

Charity number: 1089172
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2012 30 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2012 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2011 30 April 2012 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2010 14 June 2011 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 Not Required