Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT DEVON

Charity number: 1088440
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 30 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 17 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 13 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 11 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 16 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 16 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 20 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 20 January 2005 On Time