Financial history VICTIM SUPPORT DEVON

Charity number: 1088440
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £453.65k £457.02k £459.18k £505.70k £671.28k
Total expenditure £505.57k £584.57k £437.75k £434.79k £654.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £40.67k £24.90k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £13.90k £19.98k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £447.01k £620.09k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £4.12k £6.31k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £35.00k £19.71k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £422.82k £630.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £10.88k £21.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0