THE CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE-SUTTON COLDFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a place of sanctuary and support for all those affected by cancer including family and friends. Also offer a range of complementary therapies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 05 December 2001: Standard registration
- 29 November 2022: Funds received from 1029932 OAKS LADIES CLUB
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Ammar Saadi | Chair | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Ellen Susan Jinks | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Louise Maye | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON TREVELYAN | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Peter David Craig | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tarlocham Singh Randhawa | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Patrick Victor Cremins | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ann Cavanagh | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROY POLLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.26k | £158.90k | £90.89k | £104.83k | £129.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.94k | £79.93k | £107.98k | £132.11k | £160.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £705 | £30.11k | £11.83k | £10.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE CANCER SUFFERERS (INCLUDING PERSONS IN REMISSION) AND THEIR RESPECTIVE FAMILIES IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF HOLISTIC AND OTHER THERAPY TREATMENTS INCLUDING TRADITIONAL, ALTERNATIVE AND COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES AND TREATMENTS, 2. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CANCER SUFFERERS AND THEIR RESPECTIVE FAMILIES AND FRIENDS BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICE
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SECRETARY
LINDRIDGE ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
WEST MID
- Phone:
- 03000120245
- Email:
- info@suttoncancersupport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window