AIK SAATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The words Aik Saath mean Together As One in Hindi, Punjabi and Urdu. They also embody the ethos of our charity- we believe in working with young people from all backgrounds for a safer, more cohesive future. Our projects are led by young volunteers aged between 11 and 25. We deliver training, youth activities and heritage/arts projects, involving oral history and spoken word.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £66,000 from 4 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Oxfordshire
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 14 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Victoria Hunt | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Hassan | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HALEEMA ALI | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL CONLON | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAHDIA KHAN | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHAZIA AKRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £306.09k | £342.29k | £371.67k | £360.57k | £444.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.24k | £274.30k | £273.08k | £338.12k | £458.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £125.00k | £152.50k | £53.28k | £55.63k | £66.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.00k | £13.00k | £20.93k | £14.04k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 DECEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF SLOUGH AND IT'S SURROUNDING AREAS, WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS CONFLICT RESOLUTION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS, WHO MAY BECOME OR HAVE BEN INVOLVED IN ACTS OF NUISANCE, VIOLENCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE. IN DOING SO HELP WITH PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY OF SLOUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aik Saath
29 Church Street
Slough
Berkshire
SL1 1PL
- Phone:
- 01753574780
- Email:
- info@togetherasone.org.uk
- Website:
-
togetherasone.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window