BROMLEY ALCOHOL SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
Governance
- 10 September 2001: Standard registration
- 08 December 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BAS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £542.26k | £584.85k | £667.93k | £4.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £535.53k | £584.17k | £709.20k | £13.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 28 August 2008 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 27 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 27 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND DIAGNOSIS OF ALCOHOL PROBLEMS BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DANGERS OF SUCH ABUSE, AND THE REHABILITATION OF THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM ITS EFFECTS. 2. TO DEVELOP SERVICES TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THOSE WHO EXPERIENCE ALCOHOL PROBLEMS, THEIR FAMILIES, PARTNERS AND CARERS. 3. TO WORK WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO SECURE A SAFE AND HEALTHY ENVIRONMENT FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window