FRIENDS OF SABEEL UK (FOSUK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOSUK supports the Sabeel Theology Centre in Jerusalem, supports and encourages the Christian community in the Holy Land (Israel & the Palestinian areas of Gaza, the West Bank and East Jerusalem) in their life and witness and raises awareness in the United Kingdom concerning Christians in the Holy Land and promotes links with them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Conyngham | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
Professor Esther McIntosh | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nicholas Taylor | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Diana Paulding | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev John Howard | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Malcolm Woodall | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lynn McAllister | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Fairfax-Cholmeley | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Miranda Pinch | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.96k | £47.22k | £39.34k | £44.27k | £60.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.26k | £26.55k | £33.59k | £31.99k | £45.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 May 2022 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2021 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 OCT 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 APR 2012
Charitable objects
(3.) THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: (3.1) TO SUPPORT THE SABEEL THEOLOGY CENTRE IN JERUSALEM IN ITS WORK FOR THE PROMOTION OF RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY (3.2) TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY IN THE HOLY LAND (ISRAEL AND THE PALESTINIAN AREAS OF GAZA, THE WEST BANK AND EAST JERUSALEM) IN THEIR LIFE AND WITNESS (3.3) TO RAISE AWARENESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM CONCERNING CHRISTIANS IN THE HOLY LAND AND TO PROMOTE LINKS WITH THEM.
Area of benefit
JERUSALEM, THE HOLY LAND (ISRAEL AND THE PALESTINIAN AREAS OF GAZA, THE WEST BANK AND EAST JERUSALEM), AND THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sabeel Kairos UK
PO Box 293
PUDSEY
West Yorkshire
LS28 0GF
- Phone:
- 07835822728
- Email:
- info@sabeel-kairos.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window