Hospices of Hope Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hospices of Hope works through its partner organisations in Romania and the surrounding countries to relieve the suffering of terminally ill adults and children by increasing access to palliative care. The charity encourages the hospice movement through education, innovation, advocacy. The charity doesn't work directly with its vulnerable beneficiaries, the model is to support local organizations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,600,933
Donations and legacies | £1.07m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £2.52m | |
Investments | £9.97k | |
Other | £360 |
Total expenditure:
£3,399,495
Raising funds | £2.22m | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.22m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.18m | |
Retained for future use | £201.44k |
People

71 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Albania
- Greece
- Moldova
- Romania
- Serbia
- Ukraine
Governance
- 18 September 2001: Standard registration
- HOSPICE OF HOPE (Working name)
- HOSPICE OF HOPE FOR ROMANIA (Working name)
- HOSPICES OF HOPE (Working name)
- HOSPICE OF HOPE ROMANIA LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Douglas Hal Blomfield | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Denis Keefe | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andreea Petreanu | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sioned Evans | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Goldsborough | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David William Grace | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rick Woodward | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Storer | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yapincak Erkan | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Andrew Russell | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simone Yvette Ingram | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR ALISON SARAH LANDON | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67m | £2.59m | £2.55m | £3.32m | £3.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83m | £2.34m | £2.49m | £2.99m | £3.40m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £773.27k | £1.01m | £800.66k | £1.20m | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.90m | £997.27k | £1.74m | £2.12m | £2.52m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.33k | £13.92k | £1.21k | £584 | £9.97k | |
|
Income - Other | £362 | £572.44k | £360 | £360 | £360 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £90.00k | £8.46k | £0 | £0 | £14.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.01m | £896.62k | £935.89k | £1.13m | £1.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.83m | £1.44m | £1.56m | £1.86m | £2.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £33.09k | £16.50k | £17.10k | £15.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £524.62k | £524.62k | £566.68k | £586.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £426.31k | £599.82k | £603.36k | £638.18k | £689.33k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £380.00k | £425.00k | |
|
Other assets | £1.06m | £1.29m | £1.22m | £1.17m | £1.29m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £406.30k | £551.62k | £429.10k | £472.73k | £450.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 DEC 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 OCT 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 SEP 2018 as amended on 18 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF SUCH OBJECTS): - (A) TO PROMOTE THE CARE WITHOUT LIMITATIONS OF SEX, RACE OR AGE, OF PERSONS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE SUFFERING FROM ADVANCED CANCER OR OTHER LIFE-THREATENING ILLNESSES WHETHER IN HOSPITALS, NURSING HOMES, HOSPICES, CLINICS OR THEIR OWN HOMES AND TO PROVIDE MEDICAL NURSING AND OTHER TREATMENT AND ATTENTION ACCORDING TO THEIR NEEDS, TOGETHER WITH GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE FOR THOSE CARING FOR THEM. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE SUFFERING FROM ADVANCED CANCER OR OTHER LIFE-THREATENING ILLNESSES, TO MAKE PUBLICLY AVAILABLE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST IN THE TEACHING AND TRAINING OF DOCTORS, NURSES, PHYSIOTHERAPISTS, PSYCHOLOGISTS AND OTHER PERSONS ENGAGED IN THE CARE OF SUCH PERSONS. (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE SUFFERING FROM CONDITIONS OF SEVERE OR PROLONGED SHOCK OR DEPRESSION ARISING FROM BEREAVEMENT BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING FOR THE FAMILY, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF THOSE WHO HAVE DIED AFTER SUFFERING FROM TERMINAL ILLNESS. (D) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF CARE BY ALL APPROPRIATE INSTITUTIONS AND ORGANISATIONS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE FOR PERSONS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE SUFFERING FROM ADVANCED CANCER OR OTHER LIFE-THREATENING ILLNESSES AND FOR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CONDITIONS OF SEVERE OR PROLONGED SHOCK OR DEPRESSION ARISING FROM BEREAVEMENT. (E) TO ASSIST BY GRANTS OF MONEY OR OTHER HELP TO ELIGIBLE CHARITABLE OR NON-PROFIT MAKING INSTITUTIONS IN CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT
Area of benefit
CENTRAL AND EASTERN EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 HIGH STREET
OTFORD
SEVENOAKS
TN14 5PG
- Phone:
- 01959525110
- Email:
- anna@hospicesofhope.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window