PLAY RIGHT/CHWARAE IAWN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Play Right offer support services for play providers, parents and communities. Play Right work strategically to advocate for play and deliver play services across the counties of Swansea and Neath Port Talbot. Play Right offer training for parents, carers and professionals in all aspects of play. Play Right hire out a range of services for events, parties and community days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £5,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 31 August 2001: Standard registration
- 01 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PLAY RIGHT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £418.62k | £394.99k | £435.20k | £295.59k | £47.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £401.13k | £474.39k | £406.80k | £334.76k | £56.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 31 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 31 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE AREA FORMERLY KNOWN AS WEST GLAMORGAN, THESE BEING FACILITIES- I. OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES: II. WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
WEST GLAMORGAN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window