Financial history ST ALBANS CITY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1089343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £284.37k £315.56k £456.03k £480.10k £498.90k
Total expenditure £248.22k £274.53k £462.04k £491.00k £543.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.90k £10.87k £2.00k