Accounts and annual returns COLCHESTER UNITED COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1088619
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2012 29 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2012 21 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2011 12 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 12 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 30 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 21 June 2010 On Time