THE EGREMONT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A grant giving trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 2001: Standard registration
- 03 February 2016: Funds received from 259718 LORD EGREMONT'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD Lord Egremont | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LADY EGREMONT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.99k | £5.03k | £3.95k | £2.14k | £127.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.16k | £50.74k | £42.09k | £29.71k | £48.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 28 JUNE, 2001.
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT WHETHER IN ENGLAND AND WALES OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND, WALES OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ESTATE OFFICE
PETWORTH
WEST SUSSEX
GU28 ODU
- Phone:
- 01798342502
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window