THE LEE SPARK NF FOUNDATION SEVERE STREPTOCOCAL INFECTIONS AND NECROTISING FASCIITIS SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT EVERYONE WHO HAS BEEN AFFECTED BY SEVERE STREPTOCOCCAL INFECTIONS AND NECROTISING FASCIITIS. TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THIS DEVESTATING INFECTION TO THE LAYMAN AND TO THE MEDICAL PROFESSION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 17 August 2001: Standard registration
- THE LEE SPARK NF FOUNDATION SEVERE STREPTOCOCAL INFECTIONS & NECROTISING FASCIITIS SUPPORT (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Dunnington Wallace Chair | Chair | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Newland -Nell | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robin Grant | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Fraser | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilkie | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine McCulloch | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.93k | £11.14k | £18.00k | £11.95k | £26.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.46k | £6.33k | £28.00k | £5.62k | £10.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUNE 2001 as amended on 09 Jul 2018 as amended on 26 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY NECROTISING FASCIITIS & SEVERE STREPTOCOCCAL INFECTIONS AND ANY RELATED CONDITION AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BY BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC INTO NECROTISING FASCIITIS & SEVERE STREPTOCOCCAL INFECTIONS AND ITS IMPLICATIONS FOR THE FAMILY. (B) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, EFFECTS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF NECROTISING FASCIITIES & SEVERE STREPTOCOCCAL INFECTIONS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Gretdale Avenue
ST. ANNES ON SEA
Lancashire
FY8 2EF
- Phone:
- 07769322953
- Email:
- info@nfsuk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window