BIRMINGHAM ASIAN RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BARC is a social welfare agency serving the needs of the Asian Community in Birmingham and provides free advice and information on social securiy, immigration/nationality, family, housing, social and health benefits etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,600 from 2 government contract(s) and £126,176 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 24 July 2002: Standard registration
- BARC (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Imtious Sheikh | Chair | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nighet Nisa | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noel Castellino | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sobur Khan | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Haroon Majid | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD IDRISH | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.11k | £64.03k | £448.05k | £152.86k | £152.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.91k | £80.13k | £27.69k | £104.26k | £104.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £49.54k | N/A | £4.00k | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.72k | £11.97k | N/A | £5.00k | £126.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 163 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF ASIAN OR ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES OF THE SAID CITY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
149 Lozells Road
BIRMINGHAM
B19 2TP
- Phone:
- 01215230580
- Email:
- barc@asianresource.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window