Governing document THE CASTLE PLAYERS AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY OF BEAUMARIS
Charity number: 1090239
Up to date
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED 27 MARCH 2001, 22 MAY 2001, 16 OCTOBER 2001 AND 4 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO CULTIVATE AN APPRECIATION OF THEATRICAL ARTS BY PROMOTING THE READING, STUDYING AND PRODUCTION OF WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT FOR THE EDUCATIONAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF BEAUMARIS INCLUDING THE MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BEAUMARIS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.