Accounts and annual returns THE GOOD ROCK FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1089611
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 March 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 12 October 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 30 June 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 14 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 14 August 2014 On Time