WORLD OWL TRUST

Charity Number: 1107529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust's works embraces the whole range of habitat conservation and restoration, breeding and release programmes for genetic sustainability, research into wild populations and education available to all to raise awareness of threatened owl species and their habitats. On-site facilities are maintained to provide treatment and rehabilitation for sick and injured owls and other wildlife.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £84,129
Total expenditure: £130,341

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Hull Chair 25 September 2022
None on record
Steven Orton Trustee 03 March 2025
None on record
Kate Wilson Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Jacinta Cooper Trustee 25 September 2022
None on record
Darryl Atkinson Trustee 25 September 2022
None on record
Michael Fielder Trustee 25 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £81.70k £114.08k £333.94k £88.31k £84.13k
Total expenditure £123.05k £130.80k £122.93k £126.94k £130.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.43k £6.98k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MILLSTONES
BOOTLE
MILLOM
CUMBRIA
LA19 5TJ
Phone:
01229718080
Email:
jen@owls.org