THE AHMED IQBAL ULLAH EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is an inclusive, equally represented and racially just society where everyone belongs. Our mission is to make global majority history, heritage and culture more accessible, supporting excellence in research and learning through community partnerships and inclusive practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £46,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 08 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Susan Rosin MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
CATHARINE REW | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|||||
Selinah Ullah | Trustee | 01 October 2001 |
|
|
||||
Paul Okojie | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ANEEZ ESMAIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.77k | £230.20k | £202.40k | £221.57k | £204.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.86k | £174.74k | £196.32k | £180.09k | £203.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.00k | £51.00k | £46.00k | £46.00k | £46.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MAY 2001.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION ON ISSUES RELATING TO THE IMPROVEMENT OF RACE RELATIONS IN BRITAIN, HELPING TO COUNTER RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND TO HIGHLIGHT THE EXPERIENCES AND VALUES AND POSITIVE CONTRIBUTIONS OF PEOPLE OF AFRO-CARIBBEAN, AFRICAN, ASIAN ORIGIN AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor
MCC Central Library
St Peters Square
Manchester
- Phone:
- 01612752920
- Email:
- rrarchive@manchester.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window