Financial history SAXMUNDHAM MUSEUM

Charity number: 1089661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.98k £17.41k £6.06k £9.14k £6.89k
Total expenditure £8.11k £7.16k £11.42k £10.45k £9.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.95k N/A N/A N/A