KHUSHBOO GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health and Educational Activities for Older Women in the Bradford District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,019 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 08 April 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amar Kaur Panesar | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nirmal Kaur Atwal | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Kaur Cheema | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Satya Devi | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.44k | £9.78k | £10.51k | £11.56k | £13.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.64k | £6.83k | £7.09k | £12.10k | £12.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.78k | £10.27k | £13.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S (KHUSHBOO) OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ASIAN WOMEN IN BRADFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY ADVANCING EDUCATION, AND PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID ASIAN WOMEN
Area of benefit
BRADFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Thornburry Street
Bradford
BD3 8LX
- Phone:
- 07775731512
- Email:
- mrskundi@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window