GERMAN-SPEAKING LUTHERAN CHURCH IN EAST ANGLIA (PREVIOUSLY KNOWN AS HAMBURG LUTHERAN CHURCH & GERMAN LUTHERAN CHURCH IN CAMBRIDGE AND EAST ANGLIA)

Charity Number: 1135273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £113,681
Total expenditure: £104,779

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Essex
  • Milton Keynes
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 2010: Standard registration
  • 27 June 2013: Funds received from 251121-1 PROCEEDS OF SALE OF PARSONAGE
  • 27 June 2013: Funds received from 251121-2 CHURCH WORKING FUNDS
  • 27 June 2013: Funds received from 251121 TRUST PROPERTY AND FUNDS ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTIO...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DEUTSCHEN LUTHERISCHEN KIRCHE IN CAMBRIDGE UND EAST ANGLIA (Working name)
  • EVANGELISCH-LUTHERISCHE KIRCHE DEUTSCHER SPRACHE IN OSTENGLAND (VORMALS HAMBURGER LUTH. KIRCHE & DEUTSCHE LUTH. KIRCHE IN CAMBRIDGE UND EAST ANGLIA) (Working name)
  • GERMAN LUTHERAN CHURCH IN CAMBRIDGE AND EAST ANGLIA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Kerstin Othmer Chair 19 September 2020
SYNOD OF GERMAN-SPEAKING LUTHERAN, REFORMED AND UNITED CONGREGATIONS IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Dr Bianca Finger-Berry Trustee 24 February 2023
TRAUMA RESPONSE NETWORK LIMITED
Received: On time
Birgit Ewald Trustee 14 January 2023
None on record
Dr Peter Schuetz Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Andreas Christian Moering Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Daphne Alison Rose Trustee 11 June 2017
None on record
Dr Beate Becker Trustee 11 June 2017
FRIENDS OF NORFOLK COUNTY YOUTH ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Sabine Kornelia Hathaway Trustee 08 June 2014
None on record
DR GERHARD GOLDBECK Trustee
None on record
Hildegard O'Kane Trustee
SYNOD OF GERMAN-SPEAKING LUTHERAN, REFORMED AND UNITED CONGREGATIONS IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
MARGARET JOY LONGSTAFF Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £69.72k £67.85k £85.63k £90.88k £113.68k
Total expenditure £75.18k £116.05k £99.92k £108.28k £104.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SHAFTESBURY HOUSE
4 SHAFTESBURY ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 8BW
Phone:
01223 356167