Financial history HOPE IN BANGLADESH

Charity number: 1090024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.81k £4.03k £15.89k £11.82k £0
Total expenditure £9.00k £14.69k £400 £29.10k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.45k £4.17k N/A