LITMORE SHAW NATURE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As further detailed in the Report of the Trustees for the year ended 31 December 2007 and in note 11 to the Financial Statements for the year ended 31 December 2007, the charities activities were voluntarily discontinued on 3 March 2008 and the company was struck off the Register of Companies on 28 July 2008.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 14 November 2001: Standard registration
- 29 June 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.00k | £19 | £28.09k | £39.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.00k | £141.74k | £38.25k | £46.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 19 December 2005 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 19 December 2005 | 49 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH JULY 2001, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL BEAUTY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF PLANTS AND WILDLIFE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PROGRAMME OF RESEARCH INTO AND CONSERVATION OF FLORA, FAUNA AND SPECIES INDIGENOUS TO VARIOUS GEOGRAPHIC AREAS; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS, PUPILS AND PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE STUDY OF ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECOLOGICAL ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR BOTANY, CONSERVATION, GRASSLAND MANAGEMENT AND OTHER NATURAL SCIENCES. 3. TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO THE DIVERSITY OF PLANT AND ANIMAL LIFE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND 4. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window