ST NICOLAS ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1088638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising activities for St Nicolas Academy School (VA).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £5,231
Total expenditure: £6,300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SNSA (Working name)
  • ST NICOLAS (NUNEATON) SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martyn Yeo Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Laura Fitzgerald Trustee 02 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £23.77k £12.86k £8.86k £8.34k £5.23k
Total expenditure £17.48k £10.39k £2.64k £1.34k £6.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 18 June 2024 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 April 2022 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 July 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Nicolas C of E Academy
Windermere Avenue
NUNEATON
CV11 6HJ
Phone:
07736838236