WARWICK INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity educates boys and girls from ages 3 to 18 in its three independent schools in Warwick. It also rents out its facilities to members of the public through its trading subsidiary Warwick Schools Enterprises Limited.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£47,178,000
Donations and legacies | £1.40m | |
Charitable activities | £44.77m | |
Other trading activities | £439.00k | |
Investments | £564.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£47,006,000
Raising funds | £349.00k | |
Charitable activities | £46.09m | |
Other | £572.00k |
-£507,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £921.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £46.09m | |
Retained for future use | £172.00k |
People

920 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 14 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 November 2003: Standard registration
- WARWICK SCHOOLS (Previous name)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Marjory Bosworth | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Lisa Joan Ramsell | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rachel Mary Sandby-Thomas | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Christopher Mark Francis White | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Faisal Jaffri | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Jane Mackenzie-Lawrie | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
David Barr Rankin | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||
John Loudon | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Catherine Anne Robbins | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Adrian Francis Keeling KC | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Joanna Louise Broughton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Ruth Audrey Weeks | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Anne Elizabeth Wilson BEd | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Professor Damian Griffin | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
MARIE-BERNADETTE ASHE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Mrs S M Austin | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
HM LORD LIEUTENANT OF WARWICKSHIRE | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.57m | £34.59m | £42.20m | £43.35m | £47.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.31m | £35.56m | £36.61m | £39.94m | £47.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.73m | £1.16m | £5.45m | £1.06m | £1.40m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £653.00k | £467.00k | £40.00k | £399.00k | £439.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £32.74m | £32.57m | £36.34m | £41.42m | £44.77m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £443.00k | £397.00k | £372.00k | £477.00k | £564.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £775.00k | £119.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £33.21m | £34.55m | £35.88m | £39.07m | £46.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £426.00k | £369.00k | £355.00k | £319.00k | £349.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £119.00k | £121.00k | £155.00k | £185.00k | £180.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £57.00k | £62.00k | £66.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £671.00k | £643.00k | £368.00k | £551.00k | £572.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £71.46m | £76.11m | £78.35m | £76.75m | £76.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £16.81m | £15.55m | £19.48m | £19.04m | £18.84m | |
|
Other assets | £10.84m | £4.66m | £5.39m | £9.29m | £8.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£5.25m | -£5.85m | -£5.60m | £3.84m | £6.28m | |
|
Total liabilities | £29.65m | £29.83m | £28.22m | £26.88m | £26.13m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAR 2015 as amended on 01 Sep 2016 as amended on 14 Dec 2018 as amended on 11 Dec 2020 as amended on 01 Apr 2022 as amended on 30 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY CARRYING ON IN OR NEAR WARWICK, DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOLS FOR BOYS AND GIRLS.
Area of benefit
IN OR NEAR WARWICK
Linked charities
- 11 November 2003 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARWICK SCHOOL
MYTON ROAD
WARWICK
CV34 6PP
- Phone:
- 01926735400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window