CRICK WOODLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Woodland/Pocket park maintenance and enhancement
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 15 February 2002: Standard registration
- CRICK MILLENNIUM WOOD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Nigel Walker | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Geoffrey Lowe | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.39k | £10.04k | £9.20k | £13.36k | £10.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.81k | £16.73k | £7.96k | £13.15k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH NOVEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A WOOD TO BE KNOWN AS CRICK WOODLANDS, WHICH INCLUDES CRICK MILLENNIUM WOOD, CRICK JUBILEE WOOD AND FRIENDS OF CRACKS HILL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CRICK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO BE USED FOR INFORMAL RECREATION, PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vynters Manor
Crick
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 7TT
- Phone:
- 07771808450
- Email:
- walkerbyname@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window