THE EVERLASTING ARMS MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Everlasting Arms Ministries (TEAM) is an interdenominational Christian ministry devoted to deliverance, holiness, preaching of the Word and Setting the Captive free. It is our philosophy to see the less privileged in our local community, who have the zeal to advance their career prospects, receive adequate help to succeed in their endeavour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Southwark
Governance
- 14 March 2002: Standard registration
- TEAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Claudia Deigh | Trustee | 24 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olatunde Adewale SOGBESAN | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Tolulope BABARINSA | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Olayinka Ogunnoiki | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ADE ADESOLA NEWORK/TELECOME ENGINEER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £285.72k | £146.05k | £200.28k | £239.30k | £261.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £596.42k | £399.77k | £282.03k | £374.95k | £250.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 14 JUNE, 2001.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WORLD-WIDE; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY WORLD-WIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE EVERLASTING ARMS MINISTRIES
600-608 OLD KENT ROAD
LONDON
SE15 1JB
- Phone:
- 02076350822
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window