FRIENDS OF RONALD OPENSHAW NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are for the advancement of the education and development of children attending, the Ronald Openshaw Nursery Education Centre in the London Borough of Newham, particularly in ways which may increase direct parental involvement in the education and development of their children and by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities, activities & equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newham
Governance
- 13 June 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Panayiotou | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suprima Pillai | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa McAvoy | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.28k | £207 | £1.12k | £6.75k | £5.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.06k | £3.18k | £1.09k | £10.58k | £9.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 6TH DAY OF MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE RONALD OPENSHAW NURSERY EDUCATION CENTRE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM, PARTICULARLY IN WAYS WHICH MAY INCREASE DIRECT PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT IN THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR CHILDREN AND BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, ACTIVITIES, EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS PROVIDED THAT SUCH FACILITIES, ACTIVITIES, EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED OUT OF STATUTORY FUNDS.
Area of benefit
NEWHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
RONALD OPENSHAW NURSERY
HENNIKER ROAD
STRATFORD
LONDON
E15 1JP
- Phone:
- 02085346196
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window