LIGHTHOUSE EDUCATION SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LES offers tailor-made education, health,leisure,learning and support strategies to help improve the well-being of children, young people and communities. Activities & services available: 1)James Kane Nursery 2)Lighthouse Saturday School 3)Online Homework Club 4)Health and Keep Fit Classes 5)The Lighthouse Group, T-base Centre-project-aimed young people at risk of exclusion from school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 16 April 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTOR JIBUIKE | Chair |
|
||||||
Edwin Bajomo | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theo Mathias-Nwaulune | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FARODOYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.94k | £45.83k | £44.86k | £43.71k | £54.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.69k | £39.72k | £47.31k | £54.54k | £55.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.66k | £38.43k | £21.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 14TH JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR SCHOOL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING LEARNING DIFFICULTIES BY; (A) THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION IN MATHEMATICS, ENGLISH, SCIENCE, MUSIC AND OTHER SUBJECTS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE; (B) THE PROVISION OF COMPUTER HARDWARE, SOFTWARE AND TECHNICAL OR OTHER SUPPORT TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND IN SO DOING TO HELP THEM IN REALISING THEIR FULL LEARNING POTENTIAL AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMPLOYMENT AND SELF-EMPLOYMENT."
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL NATIONS CENTRE
TYERS TERRACE
LONDON
SE11 5LY
- Phone:
- 02078209917
- Email:
- hereola@l-e-s.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window