WORLD MANDATE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EQUIP AND TRAIN CHRISTIANS TO FULFIL THEIR GOD GIVEN MINISTRY. PREACH THE GOSPEL TO SUPPORT THOSE IN NEED BOTH IN UK AND ABROAD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 April 2002: Standard registration
- COMPASSION WORLDWIDE (Working name)
- ROYAL MANDATE MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Andres Lopez | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kendra Marie Lopez | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tara Morgan Bsc Msc | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Watson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Stuart Redfearn | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Colette Ann Barron | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD MAXWELL BARRETT Ph.D M.B.E | Trustee |
|
||||||
RAYMOND BARRY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.74k | £131.16k | £338.74k | £72.97k | £65.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.90k | £127.46k | £131.16k | £158.24k | £125.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.15k | £19.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 26TH JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED ON 13TH MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF EVANGELISM IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLASSES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO STUDY; (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE IN NEED THROUGH THE PROVISION AND DISTRIBUTION OF GOODS, CLOTHING AND SERVICES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORLD MANDATE MINISTRIES
Gladstone Close
Northampton
NN5 7AY
- Phone:
- 01604 759039
- Email:
- info@godsmandate.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window