THE TRIANGLE GROUP

Charity Number: 1093281
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008

Total income: £79,393
Total expenditure: £68,753

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 2002: Standard registration
  • 29 April 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £33.42k £41.82k £48.30k £59.71k £79.39k
Total expenditure £32.94k £34.20k £50.63k £67.07k £68.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 17 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 17 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 18 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 18 January 2006 On Time