THE PLYMOUTH NAVAL BASE VISITOR CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To oversee the preservation and development of a Naval Base Museum and Visitor Centre for the benefit of the Royal Navy and the public at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 03 October 2001: Standard registration
- 09 July 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PLYMOUTH DOCK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.23k | £32.78k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.83k | £33.37k | £627 | £935 | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | 28 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 16 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | 29 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 28 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | 29 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND THEREAFTER MANAGEMENT, OF A MUSEUM AND VISITOR CENTRE WHICH COLLECTS, PRESERVES AND/OR EXHIBITS, PROPERTY INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO VESSELS, ARTICLES, ARTEFACTS AND RECORDS, RELATING TO THE HISTORY AND TRADITIONS OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND THE SUPPORT PROVIDED AT PLYMOUTH BY THE DOCKYARD AND NAVAL BASE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC 3.2 TO MAKE AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, A VISITOR CENTRE FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF THE ROYAL NAVY AT PLYMOUTH 3.3 TO COLLECT PRESERVE AND EXHIBIT ARTICLES AND RECORDS RELATING TO THE HISTORY AND TRADITIONS OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND THE SUPPORT PROVIDED AT PLYMOUTH BY THE DOCKYARD AND THE NAVAL BASE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. 3.4 TO FORM ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT AND TO AID IN THE FORMATION ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE COMPANIES INSTITUTIONS ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS OR SOCIETIES FORMED FOR OBJECTS THE SAME AS OR SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE.
Area of benefit
DEVONPORT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window