FRIENDS OF LECKHAMPTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold social and fund raising events for the friends, families and staff of the school The money raised from these activities provides for additional activities, equipment and trips for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 August 2001: Standard registration
- FOLPS (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate West | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hester Cole | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Johnes | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Mowbray | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clara Jackson | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Dickens | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Treharne | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Manton | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anja Hunton | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Boyes | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.07k | £10.19k | £17.99k | £22.91k | £22.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.30k | £8.88k | £13.46k | £29.04k | £29.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 May 2023 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LECKHAMPTON C E PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leckhampton Primary School
Hall Road
CHELTENHAM
GL53 0HP
- Phone:
- 07825134562
- Email:
- chair@folps.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window