Financial history BLACK & MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1091127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £92.78k £136.75k £138.08k £124.23k £166.51k
Total expenditure £91.39k £108.55k £131.80k £176.95k £191.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £47.59k N/A N/A £16.00k