Accounts and annual returns SAFE RIDER KEIGHLEY LIMITED

Charity number: 1092629
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 05 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 July 2007 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 27 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 27 July 2004 On Time