SAFE RIDER KEIGHLEY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 26 June 2002: Standard registration
- 04 March 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.79k | £60.22k | £56.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.77k | £66.44k | £71.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 05 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 05 July 2007 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 29 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 27 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 27 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 FEBRUARY 1992 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 DECEMBER 2001 AND 22 MAY 2002.
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PERSONS RESIDENT IN KEIGHLEY AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR POVERTY OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF AN ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DANGERS FACED BY WOMEN TRAVELLING ALONE AND OF PRACTICAL METHODS COMBATING SAID DANGERS.
Area of benefit
KEIGHLEY AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window