OMAID FOUNDATION (OF.UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of this charity are: (a) The relief of poverty, sickness, distress & suffering in any part of the world including (Physical disability or affliction and sickness caused by natural disasters, particularly earthquake pestilence, war or civil disturbance) (b) The advancement of education of the public (c) The supply and transport of humanitarian aid
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- India
- Iran
- Pakistan
Governance
- 07 October 2002: Standard registration
- DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION FOR HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE (DOHA.UK) (Previous name)
- DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION FOR HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE (DOHA.UK) (Previous name)
- OMAID FOUNDATION (OF.UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMAD OMAID DOST | Chair | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
fareed dost | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
HABIB ASGHAR DOST | Trustee | 05 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
Saif Urahman Samadi | Trustee | 14 June 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/08/2019 | 07/08/2020 | 07/08/2021 | 07/08/2022 | 07/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £0 | £10 | £100 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £0 | £10 | £100 | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/02/2001 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/2013
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISTRESS & SUFFERING ANY PART OF THE WORLD INCLUDING (PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR AFFLICTION AND SICKNESS CAUSED BY NATURAL DISASTERS, PARTICULARLY EARTHQUAKE PESTILENCE, WAR OR CIVIL DISTURBANCE) (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (C) THE SUPPLY AND TRANSPORT OF HUMANITARIAN AID (D) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF IMMIGRANTS & ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE RESIDING IN OR INTENDING TO RESIDE IN THE UK TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS OF ANY NATIONALITY AND THEIR FAMILIES RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
153 Barley Lane
Ilford
IG3 8XH
- Phone:
- 00447904779912
- Email:
- omaiddost@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window