NORTH WEST KENT BUSINESS EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 28 November 2001: Standard registration
- 04 June 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.03k | £114.81k | £72.33k | £25.48k | £8.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.33k | £106.85k | £109.92k | £55.24k | £12.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 02 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 21 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 07 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 15 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 15 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 23 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 20 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 20 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 APRIL, 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND ENHANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF STUDENTS AND PUPILS ATTENDING RECOGNISED EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE BOROUGHS OF GRAVESHAM AND DARTFORD AND THE PARISHES OR DISTRICTS OF SWANLEY, HEXTABLE, KENT AND THOSE LIKE ESTABLISHMENTS OUTSIDE THE SAID BOUNDARIES BUT HAVING CLOSE AND ONGOING LINKS WITH LIKE ESTABLISHMENTS WITHIN THE SAME BY DEVELOPING, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING LOCAL BUSINESS AND EDUCATION LINKED ACTIVITIES; BRINGING THOSE PARTIES CLOSER TOGETHER IN A COHERENT PRODUCTIVE RELATIONSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH STUDENTS AND PUPILS; ENDEAVOURING TO EXTEND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BY SECURING COMMITMENTS FROM BUSINESS TO BROADEN ITS RELATIONSHIP WITH THE EDUCATION SYSTEM AND LIKEWISE TO SECURE COMMITMENTS FROM THE EDUCATION SECTION TO PARTICIPATE WITH EMPLOYERS, TRAINING PROVIDERS AND OTHERS IN ACTIVITIES TO IMPROVE THE CAPABILITIES, SKILLS AND COMPETENCE OF SAID STUDENTS AND PUPILS; TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND GOOD PRACTICE IN FURTHERING BUSINESS/EDUCATION LINKS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGHS OR DISTRICTS OF GRAVESHAM, DARTFORD, SWANLEY, HEXTABLE, IN KENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window