Financial history WILLIAM BLAKE HOUSE NORTHANTS

Charity number: 1089471
Charity reporting is up to date (230 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £2.12m £3.27m £2.97m £4.66m £3.22m
Total expenditure £2.30m £3.25m £2.97m £4.90m £3.55m
Income from government contracts £2.10m £2.67m £2.75m £4.33m £3.02m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £98.05k £96.93k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.73k £2.62k £9.58k £8.08k £5.34k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £150 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.10m £2.67m £2.75m £4.33m £3.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.41k £6.12k £337 £36 £0
Income - Other £6.12k £592.01k £211.12k £319.65k £193.46k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.30m £3.25m £2.97m £4.90m £3.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £33.12k £0 £39.89k £63.79k £50.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0