THE FRIENDS OF BERRY POMEROY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance of the parish church of St Mary's Berry Pomeroy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 26 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE DUKE OF SOMERSET JOHN MICHAEL EDWARD SOMERSET | Chair |
|
||||||
Glyn Watkin | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.94k | £5.11k | £535 | £2.46k | £1.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £3.94k | £515 | £5.80k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BERRY POMEROY BY RAISING FUNDS TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, BERRY POMEROY, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS, OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARDS.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BERRY POMEROY
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 WASHBOURNE CLOSE
BRIXHAM
TQ5 9TQ
- Phone:
- 01803859871
- Email:
- glyn850@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window