Financial history TATENDA TRUST

Charity Number: 1089397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.03k £3.73k £4.34k £4.82k £2.70k
Total expenditure £6.97k £2.49k £7.84k £4.14k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A