COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE. DIRECT (NORTHERN)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 29 October 2001: Standard registration
- 28 September 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.00k | £145.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.24k | £178.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 17 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 09 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 09 August 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WITHIN CUMBRIA, DURHAM, GATESHEAD, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, NORTHUMBERLAND, NORTH TYNESIDE, SOUTH TYNESIDE AND CLEVELAND IN SUCH A WAY THAT SUCH MEMBERS ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY AND TO ASSIST BY DIRECTLY PROMOTING THE MORE EFFECTIVE WORKING OF LOCAL CHARITABLE COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING ORGANISATIONS DESIGNED TO PURSUE THAT AIM
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA, DURHAM, GATESHEAD, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, NORTHUMBERLAND, NORTH TYNESIDE, SOUTH TYNESIDE AND CLEVELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window