Financial history THE HOUSING STUDIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1095480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £127.37k £101.33k £103.68k £117.60k £120.68k
Total expenditure £75.69k £71.48k £51.68k £94.38k £102.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A